Accounts and annual returns EXPRESSION OF WORSHIP

Charity number: 1141756
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 10 February 2015 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 February 2015 10 days late
Annual return 31 March 2013 28 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 28 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 02 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required