EXPRESSION OF WORSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly church services, bible study and prayer meetings Pastoral care Sharing the Christian faith through music Bi-weekly women/men growth and development meetings Community support services including: Workshops, seminars, music tutorials, careers advice and coaching, business start-up advice and support, one to one mentoring/coaching, counselling and sports and well-being programmes. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 May 2011: Standard registration
- 21 October 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 21 October 2015: Funds transferred to 1140948 SHILOH WORSHIP CENTRE APOSTOLIC INTERNATIONAL
- EOW (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.45k | £47.34k | £64.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.29k | £35.55k | £55.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 February 2015 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
10 February 2015 | 10 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 28 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 28 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 02 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 25 NOV 2009 CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/11/2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY IN CROYDON AND THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF: I) WORSHIP, II) PRAYER MEETINGS, III) PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND CELEBRATIONS IN MUSIC, IV) PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN THE COMMUNITY ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
CROYDON AND THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window