RICHMOND ETHNIC WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IMPROVE CONDITIONS OF WOMEN FROM ETHNIC MINORITY COMMUNITIES IN RICHMOND AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGH. IN PARTICULAR DISADVANTAGED LIVING IN SOCIAL ISOLATION DUE TO SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC AND LANGUAGE BARRIERS THROUGH PROVISION OF: SOCIALIZING AND PROMOTING HEALTHY LIFE STYLE INFORMATION AND EDUCATION SESSIONS ON A RANGE OF HEALTH AND WELLBEING MATTERS INFORMAL COUNSELLING AND MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 13 July 2010: Standard registration
- 15 May 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 22 January 2021: Funds received from 327341 THE KEITH ROBEY CHARITABLE TRUST
- REWA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £14.37k | £9.76k | £9.39k | £8.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.87k | £10.02k | £8.03k | £5.55k | £5.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 04 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 30 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 24 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 07 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JUNE 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FROM ETHNIC MINORITY COMMUNITIES LIVING AND WORKING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND, AND WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE FOR REASON OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE THROUGH: THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN PROMPTING HEALTHY LIFE STYLE AND ENCOURAGING RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, INCLUDING THOSE WHICH MEET CULTURAL NEEDS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window