Accounts and annual returns LIFE CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1136299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 October 2024 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 October 2024 244 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2024 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2024 365 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2022 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 November 2022 295 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late Download Open in new window