THE TAG FOUNDATION FOR SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief to those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage, both in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Burma
- Israel
- Kenya
Governance
- 22 July 2010: Standard registration
- THE TAG FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICARDO LEIMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Maria Radinsky | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Elias | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bellau | Trustee | 22 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yosef Ives | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £328.58k | £43.82k | £172.14k | £439.94k | £133.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £328.95k | £42.46k | £165.96k | £396.77k | £159.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF JEWISH SOCIAL VALUES, IN PARTICULAR BY FURTHERING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING JEWISH SOCIAL VALUES AMONGST THE JEWISH COMMUNITY AND OTHER COMMUNITIES GENERALLY. 2. TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Technology Park
Colindeep Lane
LONDON
NW9 6BX
- Phone:
- 02077540341
- Email:
- YOSSI@TAGDEVELOPMENT.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window