Financial history HOSPICE SERVICES AT HOME TLC LIMITED

Charity number: 1136093
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £94.57k £103.17k £124.40k £144.91k £126.73k
Total expenditure £94.56k £81.25k £124.43k £132.98k £123.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0