Financial history CHAWN HILL CHURCH

Charity number: 1135757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £264.35k £196.11k £220.89k £204.85k £231.91k
Total expenditure £253.59k £220.19k £227.80k £217.87k £222.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A