TRUMPINGTON RESIDENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Trumpington Residents' Association is to make Trumpington a better place for the future, by working to maintain and improve the quality of life of local residents. The Association manages a local community centre (Trumpington Pavilion) in partnership with Cambridge City Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £15,250 from 1 government contract(s) and £8,167 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 05 October 2010: Standard registration
- TRA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Hawkes | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Blackhurst | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANDREW ROBERTS MSC, MBA | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Blackhurst | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PLANK | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.80k | £42.59k | £60.41k | £63.15k | £60.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.99k | £48.21k | £52.95k | £62.51k | £62.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £15.25k | £15.25k | £15.25k | £15.25k | £15.25k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.07k | £17.89k | £6.08k | £8.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 February 2021 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 24 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
3 THE OBJECTS ARE TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF TRUMPINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY: 3.1 ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 3.2 ESTABLISHING OR PROMOTING A COMMUNITY CENTRE OR OTHER PREMISES AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE OR OTHER PREMISES FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
TRUMPINGTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD, CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trumpington Residents Association
Trumpington Pavilion
Paget Road
Trumpington
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 9JF
- Phone:
- 01223841181
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window