SOLAR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Client Support pertaining to emotional and practical support for our clients. Peer support, group support, respite trips, home support and referrals to specialist agencies etc. Welfare Support-Individuals and Families HIV Awareness within Northamptonshire Volunteering Projects: Solar develops a range of activities in which we train and support the volunteers to help us meet our objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 07 July 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.36k | £4.46k | £5.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.59k | £5.90k | £6.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 13 February 2014 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 March 2013 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY: A) WORKING IN AND ALONGSIDE THE COMMUNITY IN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS TO PROMOTE HEALTH ENHANCING BEHAVIOURS, INCLUDING TESTING FOR HIV/AIDS, COUNSELLING AND SEEKING APPROPRIATE TREATMENT FOR HIV/AIDS B) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THOSE INFECTED AND AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS C) PROMOTING PUBLIC EDUCATION WITH SPECIFIC REFERENCE TO HIV/AIDS AND ITS PREVENTION, TRANSMISSION AND SYMPTOMS 2. TO RELIEVE NEED AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THOSE INFECTED OR AFFECTED BY HIV OR AIDS"
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window