COMPASSION IN ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the relief or prevention of poverty, prevention of social exclusion and the provision of aftercare and support to individuals leaving treatment regimes or experiencing crises
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£808,478
Donations and legacies | £24.77k | |
Charitable activities | £783.71k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£774,794
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £774.79k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £783,710 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £774.79k | |
Retained for future use | £33.68k |
People

18 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wigan
Governance
- 13 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Ewen | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christian Ewen | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Gilligan | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Walker | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Craig Gilligan | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £445.50k | £509.46k | £914.89k | £891.00k | £808.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £455.67k | £460.36k | £692.31k | £809.08k | £774.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £366.67k | £755.84k | £827.00k | £783.71k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £103.74k | £159.05k | £64.00k | £24.77k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £39.06k | £0 | £827.00k | £783.71k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £366.67k | £755.84k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £155.00k | £692.31k | £809.08k | £774.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £305.36k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £116.26k | £151.14k | £149.97k | £132.95k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £54.14k | £143.59k | £228.62k | £297.31k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £104.90k | £6.64k | £8.58k | £26.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 August 2021 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 06 August 2021 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES 15 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN WIGAN METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING: ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN WIGAN METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE RECYCLING AND PROVISION OF CLOTHES, FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD. TO PROVIDE AFTERCARE AND SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS LEAVING TREATMENT REGIMES OR EXPERIENCING CRISISES.
Area of benefit
WIGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 OAKLANDS ROAD
LOWTON
WARRINGTON
WA3 2LA
- Phone:
- 01942262636
- Email:
- pam@compassioninaction.info
- Website:
-
compassioninaction.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window