Financial history Gainsborough Theatre Company

Charity number: 1137513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.69k £19.58k £20.12k £8.93k £9.08k
Total expenditure £11.92k £14.42k £22.12k £6.99k £27.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.10k £10.23k N/A N/A