THE JOAN WYATT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes. Trust is open to applications. Please submit your application to https://funding.ludlowtrust.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/04/2020 | 07/04/2021 | 07/04/2022 | 07/04/2023 | 07/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.48k | £8.18k | £10.70k | £10.94k | £18.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.42k | £24.36k | £11.81k | £14.67k | £34.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHAH HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF TWENTY-ONE YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHT OF THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window