Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AUGUSTINE BELVEDERE
Charity Number: 1136137

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemarie Thomas | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Davies | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kevin Smith | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Addison | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Ducker | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Brody | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Thomas David Raymond | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Fitzgibbon | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK ADDISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANDA JANE DUNNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ELLEN ELDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH JOHN TRUTZENBACH | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.