LINCOLN GREEN MOSQUE & EDUCATION CENTRE LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Islamic religion for the benefit of the public in Leeds and its surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 16 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OMAR SHEEKH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
jalal saleh jalal | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
HASAN KADER HUSEIN | Trustee | 02 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.82k | £24.39k | £53.61k | £215.57k | £333.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.84k | £28.03k | £51.98k | £107.88k | £36.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 191 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN LEEDS AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIMS AND NON-MUSLIMS, MALE OR FEMALE IN THE UK IN ISLAMIC STUDIES, ARABIC ENGLISH AND SUCH LANGUAGE THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY, AND ALSO TO PEOPLE SUFFERING IN THE UK AND ABROAD AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 DEANSWOOD CLOSE
LEEDS
LS17 5JB
- Phone:
- 07735557507
- Email:
- OMARSHEEKH@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window