Financial history MIDDLE PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1138080
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £303.44k £263.76k £226.65k £219.68k £244.13k
Total expenditure £334.13k £267.41k £237.47k £229.73k £247.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £39.75k £136.93k £92.41k £39.75k £79.17k