FINSBURY PARK MOSQUE

Charity number: 1136945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Daily prayers Regular surgeries by local MP, police and leader of the council Youth club for boys/girls Open tours including schools, universities, police and council Study circles in different subjects Weekend Islamic supplementary school Fatwa services for the Muslim community Community gathering hosted in the centre Workshops on subjects such as environment, drugs, crimes and education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £419,085
Total expenditure: £391,411

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Islington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MOHAMAD ABDUL KARIM KOZBAR Chair 13 May 2011
NORTH LONDON CENTRAL MOSQUE TRUST
Received: On time
UK CARE FOR CHILDREN
Received: On time
MUSLIM STUDENT CHARITY
Received: On time
ISLINGTON FAITHS FORUM
Received: On time
MUSLIM STUDENT CHARITY
Received: On time
Ahmed Ismail Barud Trustee 10 August 2019
NORTH LONDON CENTRAL MOSQUE TRUST
Received: On time
KHALID Oumar Trustee 13 January 2012
NORTH LONDON CENTRAL MOSQUE TRUST
Received: On time
AZIZ RAJE Trustee 13 May 2011
ISLAMIC AID
Received: On time
MUSLIM WELFARE INSTITUTE
Received: On time
MUSLIM WELFARE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
WIFAQUL ULAMA
Received: On time
NORTH LONDON CENTRAL MOSQUE TRUST
Received: On time
MIFTAHUL JANNAH ACADEMY
Received: On time
MAHMOOD-UL HASSAN Trustee 13 May 2011
ISLAMIC AID
Received: On time
MASOOM
Received: On time
NORTH LONDON CENTRAL MOSQUE TRUST
Received: On time
NAZIA HASSAN FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 1468 days
SARWAR FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £294.73k £202.94k £249.41k £307.68k £419.09k
Total expenditure £251.36k £223.45k £225.00k £275.58k £391.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £43.54k N/A N/A £80.68k £87.96k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 22 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 26 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 12 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 14 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7-11
St. Thomas's Road
London
N4 2QH
Phone:
02074245252