NATURAL DISASTER SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Natural Disaster Support works towards global advancement of education and the relief of financial need and suffering among victims of natural disasters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 June 2010: Standard registration
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.85k | £22.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.04k | £23.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 26 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 31 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 MAY 2010 AND ACCEPTED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 23 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES FALLING WITHIN SECTION 2(1) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2006 AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE INCLUDING PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THOSE ADVANCING TECHNOLOGY RELATING TO NATURAL DISASTERS) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window