HEROES HAVEN SWANAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the health of injured Armed Forces personnel, and their carers, who have been severely injured and are in financial need, by the provision, maintenance and improvement of holiday accommodation. Our aim is to raise sufficient funds through donation, sponsorship and fundraising events, to enable the purchase and running of a bespoke log cabin.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 29 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN CHURCHILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE CONNOR | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MANDY MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA WELSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.05k | £21.92k | £12.55k | £11.47k | £19.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.94k | £7.43k | £14.49k | £11.14k | £17.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 388 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 5 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH OF INJURED ARMED FORCES PERSONNEL, AND THEIR CARERS, WHO HAVE BEEN SEVERELY INJURED AND ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED, BY THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
M K L ACCOUNTANTS LTD
230 HIGH STREET
SWANAGE
BH19 2PQ
- Phone:
- 01929425552
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window