Accounts and annual returns THE CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST JEHOVAH ELIYON PARISH

Charity Number: 1136801
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 06 May 2025 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 06 May 2025 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 02 April 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 02 April 2024 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 10 May 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 07 March 2023 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 07 March 2023 341 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 01 November 2021 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 01 November 2021 215 days late Download Open in new window