RICHARD REEVE'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation seeks to fulfil its charitable objects by making grants to a small number of partner organisations to deliver benefits to people in our area of benefit through projects that maximise value for our beneficiaries through education and training. Projects are usually funded for up to three years so as to increase their effectiveness and impact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,702,614
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.70m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,771,466
Raising funds | £111.74k | |
Charitable activities | £1.66m | |
Other | £0 |
£4,953,945 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £111.74k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.66m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £111.74k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.66m | |
Retained for future use | £4.89m |
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Camden
- City Of London
- Islington
Governance
- 29 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Frood | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angelo Weekes | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Antony Dystant | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Mottershead | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hilton | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Wilson | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Gallagher | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
GERALD CHARLES ROTHWELL | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Mark Terence Jessett | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.34m | £1.23m | £1.31m | £1.61m | £1.70m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07m | £1.34m | £1.33m | £1.50m | £1.77m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.34m | £1.23m | £1.31m | £1.61m | £1.70m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £953.77k | £1.23m | £1.23m | £1.40m | £1.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £116.30k | £113.16k | £100.81k | £101.95k | £111.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.23k | £11.32k | £9.46k | £8.47k | £13.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £816.78k | £1.16m | £1.17m | £1.34m | £1.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £116.30k | £113.16k | £100.81k | £101.95k | £111.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £44.32m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £38.23m | £48.39m | £48.86m | £53.65m | |
|
Other assets | £2.05m | £12.12m | £320.35k | £424.87k | £338.49k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £159.32k | £108.04k | £150.17k | £141.95k | £174.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 APRIL 2010 as amended on 20 Jun 2018 as amended on 09 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
3. The objects for which the Foundation is established are to advance or assist in the education or care of Beneficiaries, either individually or collectively, in particular (but not exclusively) by: 3.1 awarding to Beneficiaries exhibitions, bursaries, awards, grants and maintenance allowances for any school, university, college of education or other institution of further (including professional and technical) education approved for the purpose by the Governors; 3.2 assisting Beneficiaries to train or equip themselves for a trade, profession, service or other occupation whereby they may support themselves; 3.3 assisting in the provision of facilities for education, leisure-time activities, help or training for Beneficiaries; 3.4 assisting in the provision of care, help or training for Beneficiaries; 3.5 assisting any school, college or other educational establishment attended by Beneficiaries which is conducted by a charity or is wholly or partially supported from public funds; and 3.6 assisting other charities or voluntary organisations which provide or which undertake in return to provide facilities for education, care, help or training for Beneficiaries.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON AND THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF ISLINGTON AND CAMDEN
Linked charities
- 29 July 2010 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
20-22 Wenlock Road
London
N1 7GU
- Phone:
- 02083232662
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window