THE MRS YVONNE FLUX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1136459
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the Yvonne Flux Charitable Trust are to provide charitable benefits to various other charities and voluntary bodies, and also to the general public/mankind. the trust will do this by making grants to both individuals and organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £106,167
Total expenditure: £94,700

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YVONNE FLUX Chair
None on record
TIMOTHY PAUL FLUX Trustee 27 October 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £60.02k £95.01k £73.01k £80.00k £106.17k
Total expenditure £129.91k £96.90k £76.50k £78.90k £94.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 June 2024 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 June 2024 149 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FAO: C. DODDS
ESQ
STEPHENSON SMART & CO
22-26 KING STREET
KING'S LYNN
NORFOLK
Phone:
01553774104
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available