HAMI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY WITHIN LONDON AND SOMALIA AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF, SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN LONDON AND SOMALIA FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Brent
- Camden
- City Of London
- Ealing
- Enfield
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Harrow
- Hounslow
- Islington
- Kenya
- Somalia
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Standard registration
- WABXO SOMALI SUPPORT ASSOSATION (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdullahi Mohammed | Chair | 20 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
FARHIYA HASSAN ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR AHMED MOALIM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAYLA ABDI NUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTAN SHIRE SIAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.45k | £4.60k | £3.54k | £2.55k | £1.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.79k | £3.90k | £3.50k | £2.50k | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 May 2021 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/08/2010
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY WITHIN LONDON AND SOMALIA AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF, SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE. B. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN LONDON AND SOMALIA FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE. C. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND SOMALIA, BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT. D. THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LONDON AND SOMALIA. E. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN SOMALIA
Area of benefit
LONDON AND SOMALIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 27
Down House
297 Wandsworth Bridge Road
London
SW6 2NY
- Phone:
- 07940650308
- Email:
- wabxorg@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window