THE GLEED GIRLS' TECHNOLOGY COLLEGE AND SOUTH HOLLAND POST 16 CENTRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barnardos Programme - on-site support to identified disadvantaged learners Lincolnshire Co-op business & enterprise assistance particularly at Post 16 level to enable learners to experience real-life scenarios Lincoln University visits to the campus and visits from university staff & students Governors fundraising - operating a caravan site & associated events during the annual Tulip Festival
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 03 November 2010: Standard registration
- 14 June 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 02 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL LEARNERS CONNECTED WITH THE FOUNDATION MEMBER OR AT ANY OTHER SCHOOL IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE COMPANY ACTS OR HAS ACTED AS A FOUNDATION 3.2 IT IS ACKNOWLEDGED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THE OBJECT THE COMPANY MUST HAVE REGARD TO ITS OBLIGATION UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION. 'FOUNDATION MEMBER' MEANS THE GLEED GIRLS' TECHNOLOGY COLLEGE AND ANY OTHER SCHOOL ADMITTED BY THE DIRECTORS AS A FOUNDATION MEMBER AND FOR WHICH THE COMPANY ACTS AS ITS FOUNDATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window