THE JOE GILLIGAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Joe Gilligan Trust exists to support and improve the lives of teenagers and young adults fighting Cancer. As Joe was a drummer, the trust also provides performance opportunities for young musicians for example - gigs, shows & professional mentoring. The majority of our fundraising is through music and the performing arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CRAIG GILLIGAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SAM MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE HOLLYMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT GILLIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLOTTE PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALYSON GILLIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.33k | £3.29k | £3.98k | £5.75k | £5.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.20k | £8.83k | £4.04k | £6.97k | £6.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 26 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE LIVES OF YOUNG ADULTS (AND THEIR FAMILIES) SUFFERING FROM ILLNESSES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CANCER, AND TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND SUPPORT TO THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH. TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND RESOURCES TO YOUNG MUSICIANS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12
STATION ROAD
STONE
Staffordshire
ST15 8EW
- Phone:
- 07706991412
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window