THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, EYAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family worship and community activities which enrich and facilitate community and family life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 June 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST LAWRENCE PCC, EYAM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Mary Woodfield | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Court | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janice Kay Parkinson | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Alexander Eardley | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Hartley | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Plant | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Jayne Peacock | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Mary Read | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clark Rooke | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAUL NOEL PORRITT WILES | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Linda Anne Chilcott | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
BART ERIK WAGNER | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lynn Jackson | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARGARET TORRY | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
HELEN MARY GILBERT | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR JOANNA SHAPLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.14k | £213.46k | £196.35k | £212.67k | £222.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.39k | £203.19k | £201.71k | £211.24k | £263.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EYAM PARISH CHURCH
CHURCH STREET
EYAM
HOPE VALLEY
S32 5QH
- Phone:
- 01433630930
- Email:
- admin@eyamchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window