Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, EYAM
Charity number: 1136134

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Mary Woodfield | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Court | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janice Kay Parkinson | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Alexander Eardley | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Hartley | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Plant | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Jayne Peacock | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Mary Read | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clark Rooke | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAUL NOEL PORRITT WILES | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Linda Anne Chilcott | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
BART ERIK WAGNER | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lynn Jackson | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARGARET TORRY | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
HELEN MARY GILBERT | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR JOANNA SHAPLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.