INTERNATIONAL INSPIRATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
International Inspiration (IN) aims to increase the opportunities for children and young people in low and middle income countries to access, enjoy and learn from physical education, sport and play. All its activities focus on international co-operation in the fields of sport and physical education in the following areas: education, inclusion, livelihood, health and conflict resolution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income:
£766,006
Donations and legacies | £6.55k | |
Charitable activities | £759.28k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £184 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£861,435
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £861.44k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £240,000 from government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £861.44k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
- Bangladesh
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Scotland
- St Lucia
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH SPORT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £867.05k | £978.70k | £2.64m | £819.95k | £766.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £694.25k | £736.19k | £3.08m | £1.22m | £861.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £160.00k | £240.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £361.35k | £337.52k | £219.55k | £127.44k | £6.55k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £201.19k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £505.56k | £439.99k | £2.42m | £692.12k | £759.28k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £142 | £0 | £1.72k | £388 | £184 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £689.80k | £677.36k | £3.05m | £1.18m | £861.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.45k | £17.48k | £26.17k | £38.99k | £12.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £387.24k | £252.73k | £0 | £0 | £454.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £192.02k | £1.45m | £1.06m | £532.36k | £430.57k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £19.23k | £253.80k | £296.89k | £161.89k | £155.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 17 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 17 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 11 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 20 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 08 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 15 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 14 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 23 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/02/2013
Charitable objects
(I) FOR THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF RESOURCES AND INFORMATION TO ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE YOUNG PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF ABILITY, ATTAINMENT OR POTENTIAL BETWEEN THEM) TO PARTICIPATE IN AMATEUR SPORT AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION CAPABLE OF PROMOTING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS THEREBY HELPING TO ENSURE THAT YOUNG PEOPLE HAVE ACCESS TO THE HEALTH EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL BENEFITS THAT ARE ASSOCIATED WITH PARTICIPATION IN SPORT AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION; (II) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF THE OPPORTUNITY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD TO HAVE ACCESS TO AMATEUR SPORTS ACTIVITIES IN SCHOOL SPORTS AND COMMUNITY SPORT CLUBS AND OTHER COMMUNITY BASED ORGANISATIONS CAPABLE OF PROMOTING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS FOR THE PURPOSES OF PARTICIPATION BY YOUNG PEOPLE (IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THOSE WITH SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DIFFICULTIES) IN SPORT IN A MANNER WHICH ENCOURAGES AN UNDERSTANDING OF RULES, DISCIPLINE, CONVENTIONS OF FAIR PLAY AND TEAM SPIRIT; (111) TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS AND WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THAT OBJECT TO PROVIDE FUNDS AND TO ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF RESOURCES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN PHYSICAL RECREATION AND SPORT; (IV) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF OR RESEARCH INTO THE INDIVIDUAL AND PUBLIC HEALTH EDUCATION EQUALITY AND COMMUNITY CITIZENSHIP BENEFIT WHICH ARISES OR MAY ARISE FROM THE PARTICIPATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANY AMATEUR SPORT, SPORTING ACTIVITY OR ANY OTHER FORM OF PHYSICAL EDUCATION OR RECREATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD CAPABLE OF PROMOTING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS EITHER BY DIRECT GRANT TO OR REMUNERATION OF INDIVIDUALS ENGAGED IN SUCH STUDY OR RESEARCH OR BY PAYMENT TO AIRY EXISTING OR FUTURE ACADEMIC INSTITUTION OR OTHER ORGANISATION ENGAGED IN SUCH STUDY OR RESEARCH; 4 (V) OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN DIFFERENT PARTS OF THE WORLD, SUCH OBJECTS AND PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window