Financial history Rooted Finance Limited

Charity number: 1138351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £309.00k £373.00k £517.82k £499.76k £655.00k
Total expenditure £289.00k £323.00k £469.47k £405.71k £591.00k
Income from government contracts £248.00k £206.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.00k £51.00k £366.12k £403.83k £335.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £200 N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £517.62k N/A £655.00k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £468.25k N/A £591.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £1.22k N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £5.40k N/A £2.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0