FUTURE LEADERS UCC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the work of the Under privileged children home in Ghana by raising awareness of the centres work in the UK and fund raising for the centre in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
- Ghana
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Standard registration
- 11 August 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 11 August 2023: Funds transferred to 1177808 FUTURESTARS (WEST AND CENTRAL AFRICA)
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.59k | £13.14k | £23.56k | £7.61k | £4.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.10k | £16.63k | £27.51k | £6.75k | £6.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2023 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 6 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF ORPHANED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN GHANA AND THE UK BY - 4 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, 4 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, 4 3 THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH, 4 4 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SPIRITUAL, EMOTIONAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
GHANA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window