BRAMCOTE OLD CHURCH TOWER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust has continued to organise a programme of events during the year, both on site and at other venues, allowing for Covid restrictions. We have arranged an Easter Egg trail, sale of volunteer made bird and bat boxes, bird spotting trail, a bat watch, make your own Mothering Sunday giftm a Pumpkin Trail and we also opened during Heritage weekend in September. The grounds are always open.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 12 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gail Louise Graham | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Mary Naidoo | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richard Brown | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|||||
JASON RICHARD MORDAN | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY ASHWORTH | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Moira Robinson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.70k | £49.12k | £60.08k | £55.94k | £13.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.62k | £46.68k | £58.10k | £65.75k | £5.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 May 2021 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 May 2021 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 07 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
1 THE CARE FOR THE PROVISION OF MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND RESTORATION OF THE GRADE II LISTED BRAMCOTE OLD CHURCH TOWER AND ITS GROUNDS, WHICH IS A PLACE OF LOCAL HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST 2 TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF THE BRAMCOTE OLD CHURCH TOWER AND GROUNDS 3 TO ENHANCE AND CONSERVE THE NATURAL HABITAT AND BIODIVERSITY WITHIN THE SITE 4 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SECURING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND USE OF BRAMCOTE OLD CHURCH TOWER 5 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE USE, FUNCTION, DEVELOPMENT, HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF BRAMCOTE OLD CHURCH TOWER IN GENERAL
Area of benefit
BRAMCOTE OLD CHURCH TOWER
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 TROUTBECK CRESCENT
BRAMCOTE
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 3BP
- Phone:
- 01159226782
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window