GURU NANAK GURDWARA (BILSTON) SIKH TEMPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to advance the Sikh religion and Punjabi culture by providing facilities for the religious, educational, health and social needs of the Sikh community and the wider community in Bilston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 11 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbinder Singh | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Balwinder Kaur | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gurpal Singh | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Balbir Singh | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.78k | £90.93k | £87.87k | £37.00k | £104.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.99k | £60.32k | £47.73k | £26.12k | £26.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 453 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 453 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 September 2022 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 September 2022 | 209 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 September 2022 | 574 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 September 2022 | 574 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION IN BILSTON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, READINGS FROM THE GURU GRANTH SAHIB (SCRIPTURES), LECTURES, TEACHINGS OF THE TEN SIKH GURUS AND OF GURU NANAK DEV, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE SIKH RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE SIKH RELIGION. 3.2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN BILSTON. 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN LANGUAGES AND MUSIC. 3.4 THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 3.4.1 EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS. 3.4.2 PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. 4. APPLICATION OF THE INCOME AND PROPERTY
Area of benefit
BILSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARTHUR STREET - GREENCROFT
WOLVERHAMPTON
WEST MIDLANDS
WV14 0DG
- Phone:
- 01902496135
- Email:
- bilstonsikh@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window