THE VALIANT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees meet regularly to decide on the grants they wish to make.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Ian Graham Dixon | Trustee | 23 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR ROGER WOOLFE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £600.96k | £482.99k | £697.00k | £373.38k | £137.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £336.35k | £380.47k | £421.28k | £1.29m | £276.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £506.14k | N/A | £616.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £616.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £94.83k | N/A | £80.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £310.59k | N/A | £395.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £25.75k | N/A | £26.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.10k | N/A | £24.71k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £290.49k | N/A | £370.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £25.75k | N/A | £26.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/03/2010
Charitable objects
(1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (2) PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF TWENTY ONE YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR. (3) PROVIDED FURTHER THAT NOTWITHSTANDING ANYTHING CONTAINED IN THIS DEED NO PART OF THE TRUST FUND OR THE INCOME THEREOF SHALL BE PAID OR APPLIED OTHERWISE THAN FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Collyer Bristow LLP
St Martin's Court
10 Paternoster Court
London
EC4M 7EJ
- Phone:
- 02074704407
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window