ST IVES ARCHIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Archive collects information about all aspects of the history of the St Ives area and makes it available to the general public. This includes photographs, and oral history recordings. Volunteers undertake research, produce publications and set up displays in local venues. The Centre provides outreach facilities for the elderly and young, working closely with local schools and colleges.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- 14 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYN BURCHESS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Anthony Carre | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Walton | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Lait | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Daryl Mason | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE MAUREEN SKEWES | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DIANE LESLEY CALLICOTT | Trustee | 10 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.45k | £19.06k | £20.38k | £18.00k | £14.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.05k | £14.52k | £18.93k | £21.47k | £18.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £5.00k | £6.50k | £2.00k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, INHABITANTS, GEOGRAPHY, NATURAL HISTORY, THE ARTS, ARCHITECTURE AND CULTURE OF THE PARISHES OF ST IVES, HALSETOWN, TOWEDNACK, CARBIS BAY AND LELANT IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARCHIVE AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF ST IVES, HALSETOWN, TOWEDNACK, CARBIS BAY AND LELANT IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wesley Methodist Church
St Ives Road
Carbis Bay
St Ives
Cornwall
TR26 2SF
- Phone:
- 01736 796408
- Email:
- admin@stivesarchive.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window