CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST GREATER LONDON PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, THE RELIEVE OF POVERTY AND THE CHARITABLE SUPPORT OF INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Oxfordshire
- Slough
- Nigeria
Governance
- 02 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUP. EVAN ADEYEYE OLABAMIJI OYELAKIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mother Celestial Elizabeth Titilayo Oyelakin | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prophetess Ibilola Ijaola Eniola | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Superior Evangelist Olusegun Idowu Ajayi | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
BEATRICE OLOWOSILE | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.95k | £87.38k | £119.14k | £93.59k | £135.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.11k | £77.98k | £96.27k | £109.30k | £146.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
The Churchãs objects (the Objects) are the advancement of the Christian religion for the benefit of the public in accordance with the doctrine and statements of belief of the Community of Christ.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 17
Hadyn Park Court
Curwen Road
London
W12 9AL
- Phone:
- 07950706174
- Website:
-
cccgreaterlondonparish.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window