OFFICERS MESS HCMR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's object is 'the promotion of efficiency of the armed forces of the Crown by the provision and support of facilities and activities for the efficiency and well-being of service personnel'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 July 2010: Standard registration
- 17 March 2025: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.35k | £22.93k | £23.57k | £59.47k | £33.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.90k | £21.16k | £25.75k | £67.65k | £42.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2025 | 380 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2025 | 399 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 July 2023 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 01 OCT 2009
Charitable objects
The charity's object (the object) is 'the promotion of efficiency of the armed forces of the Crown by the provision and support of facilities and activities for the efficiency and well-being of service personnel'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window