Financial history THE LLANDDAROG AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SHOW SOCIETY

Charity number: 500979
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £24.69k £24.85k £2.06k £0 £21.13k
Total expenditure £23.32k £21.08k £5.98k £626 £23.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A