INDEPENDENT CANCER PATIENTS' VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ICPV is a patient advocate group-the UK needs an independent cancer patients' group, whose strategy is led by patients. The aim is that medical research, and clinical trials contributing to that research, have a patient input- in order for the research to have the co-operation of patients, leading to improved outcomes for all cancer patients and to help contribute to the cure of all cancers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 2010: Standard registration
- ICPV (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Chuter | Chair | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Peter Hill | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Alice Stobart | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Isabel Grayson | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Flavel | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Mary Banks | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS FINCH FCA | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MAIREAD MACKENZIE | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADRIENNE MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £3.00k | £8.80k | £23.43k | £21.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £565 | £251 | £12.84k | £25.84k | £16.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG THOSE SUFFERING FROM CANCER BY PARTICIPATING IN CLINICAL RESEARCH AND THE SHARING OF INFORMATION WITH HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND PATIENTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 WOODBRIDGE STREET
LONDON
EC1R 0LL
- Phone:
- 020 7608 1152
- Email:
- ADRIENNE@ICPV.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
icpv.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window