Financial history CHESTERFIELD AND DISTRICT SHOPMOBILITY

Charity number: 1136369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £63.28k £68.46k £77.01k £60.26k £60.57k
Total expenditure £62.75k £63.01k £68.90k £73.44k £68.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.79k £31.79k £30.98k £10.48k £0