CITY WILDLIFE CARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
City Wildlife Care is a charity dedicated to the rescue, treatment and rehabilitation of injured and orphaned wildlife in the NP Postcode area of South Wales. 24 hour service everyday of the year,; Rescue, first aid and transportation of the animal. veterinary care when needed. Rehabilitation until release. We also offer over the phone advice on wildlife and educational visits to schools and group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 09 August 2010: Standard registration
- 09 November 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2011 | 01/05/2012 | 01/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.03k | £7.22k | £8.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £6.53k | £8.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2013 | 05 May 2014 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2012 | 28 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 01 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF WILD ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH WILDLIFE, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE WELFARE OF WILDLIFE IN GENERAL, WILDLIFE CONSERVATION AND THE PREVENTION OF SUFFERING AMONG WILD ANIMALS IN AND AROUND NEWPORT CITY, TORFAEN, BLAENAU GWENT AND MONMOUTHSHIRE
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND NEWPORT CITY, TORFAEN, BLAENAU GWENT AND MONMOUTHSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window