Financial history GREAT UNITED CHILDREN

Charity number: 1136864
Charity reporting is overdue by 858 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £9.28k £5.11k £7.77k £8.93k £4.00k
Total expenditure £9.10k £5.11k £7.11k £8.93k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A