Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SELBY WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Charity Number: 500985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 August 2024 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 August 2021 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required