RESTORATION BELIEVERS MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR MEETINGS TO TEACH,EQUIP, TRAIN INDIVIDUALS ON THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH,Bereavement counselling,Hospital Visits,Welfare Provision,prayer support, Men meetings/events,Youth meetings,Women meetings/events,Pre-marital, Singles seminars, Marriage seminars, Sunday school and computer training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 04 June 2010: Standard registration
- PLACE4RESTORATION (Working name)
- R.B.M.I.C. (Working name)
- RESTORATION BELIEVERS MINITRIES INTERNATIONAL CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jocelyn Thomas Kwofie | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET QUARM | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE ABA APPIAH | Trustee | 02 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.47k | £24.50k | £24.80k | £24.60k | £25.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.47k | £24.30k | £24.70k | £24.40k | £24.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 April 2025 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 May 2024 | 429 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 January 2023 | 331 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/11/2014
Charitable objects
"TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH [THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE] AND CHRISTIAN DOCTRINES "THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY MAINLY IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND OTHER PLACES - NATIONALLY OR OVERSEAS BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS AND SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS (LOCAL, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS) WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY."
Area of benefit
BECKHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
YMCA Building
1 North Sixth Street
Milton Keynes
MK9 2NR
- Phone:
- 07463930185
- Email:
- info@rbmic.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window