GLOBAL CITY INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to relieve sickness and financial hardship and to promote and preserve good health by the provision of funds, goods or services of any kind, including through the provision of counselling and support to advance education advance the Christian faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 September 2010: Standard registration
- ROYAL CITY MISSION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NGWEFAH AMANG | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
FONLOVELINE PETIAMBOH-PEKELEKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/04/2020 | 29/04/2021 | 29/04/2022 | 29/04/2023 | 29/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.62k | £53.48k | £54.86k | £60.41k | £80.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.33k | £50.57k | £43.73k | £53.73k | £79.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 April 2024 | 02 March 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2024 | 02 March 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 April 2023 | 18 July 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2023 | 18 July 2024 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 April 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 April 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 April 2020 | 30 May 2021 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2020 | 30 May 2021 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
1.1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 1.3 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT;
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
R/O 55 Lakedale Road
R/O 55 Lakedale Road
LONDON
SE18 1PR
- Phone:
- 07776056962
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window