THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL, TAUNTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England. Worship and community in Galmington, Taunton. Mission statement - "St Michael's recognises that Church and community are equally loved by God. He has called us to serve him, each other and the wider community by bringing a sense of the presence of Christ to all."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 04 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kalpeni Saumya Perera Bamina Hannadige | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Jones | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mx Zahari Eliana Brimacombe | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Frances Elizabeth Reeder | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Evelyn Garrod | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Esme Willey | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Patricia Vittery | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris George | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bob Nicholls | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Vittery | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lindsay | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.83k | £60.37k | £67.10k | £84.45k | £84.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.75k | £52.05k | £74.39k | £97.18k | £81.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MICHAELS CHURCH
PITTS CLOSE
TAUNTON
TA1 4TP
- Phone:
- 01823332371
- Email:
- stmikestaunton@gmail.com
- Website:
-
stmichaelstaunton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window