THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S, TOTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Peter's is a Church of England Parish Church and provides church services, pastoral care and open youth work in the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 June 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETER'S PCC, TOTON (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Fiona Houghton | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Day | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Drewry | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Spencer | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lowman | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bruce David Spencer | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Treadway | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret McBrayne | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Vera Dann | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cartwright | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Irene Smith | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Phillip Briggs | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Greenberry | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MURRAY | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ROBERT PEARSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT ARTHUR MEWES BSC FRICS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.78k | £85.74k | £81.15k | £94.67k | £91.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.80k | £91.28k | £79.43k | £89.05k | £91.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Church
83 High Road
Toton
Nottingham
NG9 6EN
- Phone:
- 01159462357
- Email:
- contact@totonchurches.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window