Accounts and annual returns THE ALDERMAN L R GUY (POLICE) AWARDS

Charity number: 500990
Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days