TRINITY CHURCH, SUTTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the Christian faith in the Sutton area and its surrounds in accordance with the principles and practices of Methodist and United Reformed Church via the celebration of public worship, teaching the Christian faith, mission and evangelism, pastoral work including visiting the sick and the bereaved, provision of facilities for the local community, support of other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Merton
- Sutton
Governance
- 28 June 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sowjanya Raju Amartaluri | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dani Mukusha | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Adwoa Nyamedom Opoku-Appiah | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Gordon Maclaren | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hendry Ponniah M Min | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Abigail Ruth Hustler | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Lorraine Harriott | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Audrey Aikines-Aryeetey | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pedra Mckenna | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Cornwell | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Francis Nii Addo Allotey | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM BOOTH | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.70k | £153.94k | £188.08k | £188.08k | £212.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.80k | £128.81k | £135.60k | £135.60k | £175.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
The purpose of the Charity is to advance the Christian faith in the Area of Benefit in accordance with the principles and practices of the Participating Churches. In achieving its purpose, the Charity will engage in a range of activities, either on its own or with others, including (but not restricted to): a) the celebration of public worship; b) the teaching of the Christian faith; c) mission and evangelism; d) pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved; e) the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, including (but not restricted to) the elderly, the young and other groups with special needs; and f) the support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trinity Church Sutton
16 Cheam Road
Sutton
SM1 1DZ
- Phone:
- 020 8643 6884
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window