DARLINGTON AREA CHURCHES YOUTH MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DACYM works from an inclusive Christian value base, using the principles of informal education and community development. It is our aim that through this work, the lives of young people will be transformed educationally, socially and spiritually, thus empowering them to achieve their full potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 26 July 2010: Standard registration
- DACYM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Francis John Middleton-Evans | Chair | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Melville Moon | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Hunter | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Carling | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Susan Meeks | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Trisha Marie Raeburn-Prouse | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND COLIN JAY BA | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Rev Damon John Bage | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.29k | £64.68k | £61.03k | £77.64k | £70.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.18k | £64.89k | £67.14k | £77.76k | £79.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 6 JULY 2010 as amended on 27 Feb 2020 as amended on 25 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
1.1 The Charity's objects are restricted specifically, in each case only for the public benefit to: (a) advance the education of children and young people including but not limited to support and mentoring in schools, colleges and other educational establishments as well as within their family environment; provision of lunchtime and after-school clubs and street-based youth work and other youth provision to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities, that they may grow to full maturity as individuals, and that their condition of life may be improved; (b) advance the Christian faith for the benefit of children and young people in accordance with the Statement of Faith by proclaiming Christian messages of a teaching nature in keeping with the Christian gospel by demonstrating, promoting and encouraging Christian values, including but not limited to dignity, empowerment and partnership, to all young people in, but not restricted to, the Borough of Darlington; (d) relieve poverty and sickness thereby demonstrating the Christian faith including, but not limited to, promoting overseas service, education, practical action and working with those affected, either directly or through relevant relief agencies.
Area of benefit
DARLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The DACYM Office
Elm Ridge Methodist Church
Carmel Road South
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL3 8DJ
- Phone:
- 07717336183
- Email:
- treasurer@dacym.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window