Accounts and annual returns SHINING HOPE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137001
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2017 19 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 19 March 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2016 19 May 2017 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 19 May 2017 49 days late
Annual return 31 May 2015 23 July 2016 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 July 2016 114 days late