Project Youth Cancer

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, PRIMARILY THOSE AGED BETWEEN 15 - 25, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDING FOR RESEARCH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 September 2010: Standard registration
- 02 March 2020: Funds received from 1058464 THE LAURA CRANE TRUST
- Project Youth Cancer (Working name)
- THE LAURA CRANE TRUST (Working name)
- THE LAURA CRANE YOUTH CANCER TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Fitton | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dransfield | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GRAEME NEWMAN | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Armytage | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nikolaos Georgopoulos | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Raleigh | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Ponting | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.01k | £166.04k | £166.63k | £142.84k | £119.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.61k | £143.23k | £134.92k | £142.71k | £160.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £90.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 2008 AND AMENDED BY CHANGE OF NAME 12 JUNE 2009 as amended on 06 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, PRIMARILY THOSE AGED BETWEEN 15-25, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDING FOR RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aspin House
Block B
Station Road
Huddersfield
West Yorkshire
HD2 1UT
- Phone:
- 01484510013
- Email:
- hello@projectyouthcancer.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window